THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 15:19:57 PM
Dicu, Armela Ovidia
CPSO#:
100029
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Romanian
Education: University of Toronto, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Grand River Regional Cancer Centre
835 King St West
Kitchener ON N2G 1G3
Phone: 519-748-6976
Fax: 519-749-4378
Electoral District: 03
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Grand River Hospital Corporation |
Kitchener |
Guelph General Hospital |
Guelph |
St Mary's General Hospital |
Kitchener |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Hematology |
Effective:03 Nov 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ARMELA OVIDIA DICU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DICU is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 08 Apr 2013 to 26 Apr 2013
EL - Hematology
McMaster University, 13 May 2013 to 31 May 2013
EL - Hematology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 08 Apr 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 26 Apr 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 May 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 May 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2014 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2015 |