skip to content

Dickson, Lisa Marie

CPSO#: 86462

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Feb 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Publicover, Lisa Marie (used until: 24 Oct 2007 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: L.M. Dickson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 10 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 22 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 23 Sep 2009 to 22 Sep 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 23 Sep 2010 to 22 Sep 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
CF - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Feb 2015