THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 12:50:57 PM
Dickson, Lisa Marie
CPSO#:
86462
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
02 Feb 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
30 Jun 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Publicover, Lisa Marie (used until: 24 Oct 2007 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: L.M. Dickson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 10 2015
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Plastic Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 22 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery
McMaster University, 23 Sep 2009 to 22 Sep 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery
McMaster University, 23 Sep 2010 to 22 Sep 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery
McMaster University, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
CF - Plastic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2012 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 02 Feb 2015 |