skip to content

Diaz, Liliana

CPSO#: 84895

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 12 Aug 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 12 Aug 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: MacKenzie, Liliana (used until: 23 Oct 2013 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Universidad De La Sabana, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Westminster Woods Medical Center
33 Farley Dr.
Guelph ON  N1L 0B7
Phone: (519) 837-8137
Fax: (519) 822-8240 Electoral District: 03

Additional Practice Location(s)

108-21 Surrey St W
Guelph ON  N1H 3R3
Canada
Phone: (519) 767-2165
County: County of Wellington
Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Liliana Diaz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 6 2018
Corporation Name: Dr. L. Diaz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 30 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Diaz ( CPSO# 84895 )

Business Address:
1-33 Farley Dr
Guelph ON  N1L 0B7
Phone Number: 519-897-8137

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:19 Dec 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. LILIANA DIAZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DIAZ is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2006 to 23 Sep 2006
AVP - Family Medicine

Western University, 24 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2008 to 02 Mar 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Western University, 03 Mar 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2009 to 02 Mar 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Western University, 03 Mar 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2012 to 10 Sep 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 Sep 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Jan 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Aug 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 2014