THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 3:05:39 AM
Diaz, Liliana
CPSO#:
84895
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
12 Aug 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
12 Aug 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
MacKenzie, Liliana (used until: 23 Oct 2013 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Spanish
Education: Universidad De La Sabana, 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
104-175 Chancellors Way
Guelph ON N1G 0E9
Phone: 5198217776
Fax: 5198237776
Electoral District: 03
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Guelph General Hospital |
Guelph |
Homewood Health Centre |
Guelph |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:19 Dec 2013 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. LILIANA DIAZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DIAZ is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2006 to 23 Sep 2006
AVP - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 24 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2008 to 02 Mar 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 03 Mar 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2009 to 02 Mar 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 03 Mar 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 10 Sep 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Sep 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 10 Sep 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 04 Jan 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 12 Aug 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Aug 2014 |