skip to content

Dhillon, Gurpreet Singh

CPSO#: 97747

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Windsor University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lacoste Medical Centre
60 Lacoste Blvd. Unit 105
Brampton ON  L6P 2K2
Phone: (905) 799-9800
Fax: (905) 799-9812 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: GS Dhillon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 05 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Dhillon ( CPSO# 97747 )

Business Address:
Suite 105
60 Lacoste Boulevard
Brampton ON  L6P 2K2
Phone Number: (905) 799-9800

Business Address:
260-2525 Old Bronte Road
Oakville ON  L6M 4J2
Phone Number: (289) 837-1116

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:27 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. GURPREET SINGH DHILLON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DHILLON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 24 Sep 2012
AVP - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 25 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2014