THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 11:27:28 AM
Dhillon, Gurpreet Singh
CPSO#:
97747
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Jun 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Panjabi/Punjabi
Education: Windsor University School of Medicine, 2011
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Lacoste Medical Centre
60 Lacoste Blvd. Unit 105
Brampton ON L6P 2K2
Phone: (905) 799-9800
Fax: (905) 799-9812
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:27 Jun 2014 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. GURPREET SINGH DHILLON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DHILLON is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 24 Sep 2012
AVP - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 25 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 25 Sep 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jun 2014 |