skip to content

Desroches, Gilles

CPSO#: 26202

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jul 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 15 Oct 1973

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education: Université Laval Faculté de Médecine, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Gilles Desroches Medecine Societe Professionnelle
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 9 2019
 

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address:

Medical records storage facility: Records management Ltd.
Paitents looking to obtain copies of their medical charts should contact toll free:
1-800-775-0093

www.recordsregistry.ca

or 

13 - 1 High Meadow Place
Toronto ON M9L 0A3
Date Received: 04 Jul 2019


Instructions/Address:

Records Management Ltd
I High Meadow Place
North York, ON  M9L 0A3

Phone: 1-800-775-0093
www.recordsregistry.ca
Date Received: 28 May 2019


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective:01 Jan 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Oct 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2019