THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 5:38:47 AM
Desroches, Gilles
CPSO#:
26202
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
01 Jul 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
15 Oct 1973
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Université Laval Faculté de Médecine, 1971
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Gilles Desroches Medecine Societe Professionnelle
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 9 2019
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Medical records storage facility: Records management Ltd.
Paitents looking to obtain copies of their medical charts should contact toll free:
1-800-775-0093
www.recordsregistry.ca
or
13 - 1 High Meadow Place
Toronto ON M9L 0A3
Date Received: 04 Jul 2019
Instructions/Address:
Records Management Ltd
I High Meadow Place
North York, ON M9L 0A3
Phone: 1-800-775-0093
www.recordsregistry.ca
Date Received: 28 May 2019
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Quebec
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Ophthalmology |
Effective:01 Jan 1978 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Oct 1973 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jul 2019 |