Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 10 Jul 2012
Summary:
On July 10, 2012, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Ian Egbert DePass committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession. Dr. DePass admitted to the professional misconduct. Since early August 2008, Dr. DePass has been practising only as a surgical assistant.
The Discipline Committee found that Dr. DePass failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession in relation to his care and treatment of five patients. The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:
1. the Registrar maintain the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. DePass' certificate of registration:
(i) Dr. DePass' practice shall be limited to being a surgical assistant in a hospital setting, and he may only practise as a surgical assistant while a certified surgeon who has been approved by the College is performing the surgery and is in attendance. This means that he may only assist other surgeons on their cases and cannot be the primary surgeon in any case, and that he is precluded from providing preoperative and postoperative care or any office practice.
(ii) That notice be placed in the operating room area so that all professional staff are aware of the restrictions noted in (i).
(iii) That so long as the above terms, conditions and limitations are in effect, Dr. DePass shall cooperate with unannounced inspections of his practice and patient charts by a College representative for the purpose of monitoring and enforcing his compliance with them.
2. Dr. DePass appear before the panel to be reprimanded.
3. Dr. DePass pay costs to the College in the amount of $3,650 within ninety (90) days from the date of this Order.
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): July 10, 2012
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 08 Oct 2009
Summary:
On October 8, 2009, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Depass, a general surgeon, committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession. The Committee also found that Dr. Depass is incompetent, that is, his care of three patients displayed a lack of knowledge, skill and judgment and disregard for patient welfare of such a nature and to an extent that demonstrates that he is unfit to continue to practise or that his practice should be restricted.
The Committee found that Dr. Depass failed to meet the standard of practice and is incompetent with respect to his management of the abdominal surgery of three patients including aspects of pre-operative, intra-operative and post-operative care such as:
Regarding Patient A, failing to take sufficient steps to confirm the working diagnosis in advance of the operation and in the post-operative management of the patient.
Regarding Patient B, in failing to conduct a radiologic procedure during surgery and failing to undertake sufficient investigations during the post-operative period before discharging the patient.
Regarding Patient E, in failing to refer the patient to a surgeon with the requisite skill to manage a difficult and locally-advanced tumor.
On March 30, 2010, the Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:
1. Dr. DePass attend before the panel to be reprimanded on a date not later than three months from the date that the order becomes final.
2. The Registrar impose the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. DePass' certificate of registration for an indefinite period of time:
a) Dr. DePass' practice shall be limited to being a surgical assistant in a hospital setting, and he may only practise as a surgical assistant while a certified surgeon who has been approved by the College is performing the surgery and is in attendance. This means that he may only assist other surgeons on their cases and cannot be the primary surgeon in any case, and that he is precluded from providing pre-operative and post-operative care or any office practice.
b) That notice be placed in the operating room area so that all professional staff are aware of the restrictions noted in (a).
c) That so long as the above terms, conditions and limitations are in effect, Dr. DePass shall co-operate with unannounced inspections of his practice and patient charts by a College representative for the purpose of monitoring and enforcing his compliance with them.
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): June 22-24 and June 26 continuing July 7-9, 2009