THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 10:56:18 AM
Depass, Ian Egbert
CPSO#:
64925
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
05 May 1992
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
07 Aug 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Memorial University of Newfoundland Facu, 1989
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
45 Kensington Pl
Chatham ON N7M 2X7
Electoral District: 01
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Chatham Public General Hospital Society |
Chatham |
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance |
Chatham |
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto |
Toronto |
Hospital Notices
Source: Hospital
Active Date: December 14, 2021
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Note: This matter has been appealed to the Health Professions Appeal and Review Board.
On December 14, 2021, Chatham-Kent Health Alliance notified the College, pursuant to section 33(b) of the Public Hospitals Act and section 85.5(1) of the Health Professions Procedural Code (Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991), that Chatham-Kent Health Alliance suspended Dr. DePass’ hospital privileges effective November 1, 2021 due to failure to comply with hospital policy.
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:17 Jun 1997 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 May 1992 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 07 Aug 2008 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Executive Committee |
Effective: 07 Aug 2008 |
Terms and conditions amended by Discipline Committee |
Effective: 30 Mar 2010 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Discipline Committee |
Effective: 30 Mar 2010 |
|
Active |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 10 Jul 2012
Summary:
On July 10, 2012, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Ian Egbert DePass committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession. Dr. DePass admitted to the professional misconduct. Since early August 2008, Dr. DePass has been practising only as a surgical assistant.
The Discipline Committee found that Dr. DePass failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession in relation to his care and treatment of five patients. The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:
1. the Registrar maintain the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. DePass' certificate of registration:
(i) Dr. DePass' practice shall be limited to being a surgical assistant in a hospital setting, and he may only practise as a surgical assistant while a certified surgeon who has been approved by the College is performing the surgery and is in attendance. This means that he may only assist other surgeons on their cases and cannot be the primary surgeon in any case, and that he is precluded from providing preoperative and postoperative care or any office practice.
(ii) That notice be placed in the operating room area so that all professional staff are aware of the restrictions noted in (i).
(iii) That so long as the above terms, conditions and limitations are in effect, Dr. DePass shall cooperate with unannounced inspections of his practice and patient charts by a College representative for the purpose of monitoring and enforcing his compliance with them.
2. Dr. DePass appear before the panel to be reprimanded.
3. Dr. DePass pay costs to the College in the amount of $3,650 within ninety (90) days from the date of this Order.
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): July 10, 2012
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 08 Oct 2009
Summary:
On October 8, 2009, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Depass, a general surgeon, committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession. The Committee also found that Dr. Depass is incompetent, that is, his care of three patients displayed a lack of knowledge, skill and judgment and disregard for patient welfare of such a nature and to an extent that demonstrates that he is unfit to continue to practise or that his practice should be restricted.
The Committee found that Dr. Depass failed to meet the standard of practice and is incompetent with respect to his management of the abdominal surgery of three patients including aspects of pre-operative, intra-operative and post-operative care such as:
Regarding Patient A, failing to take sufficient steps to confirm the working diagnosis in advance of the operation and in the post-operative management of the patient.
Regarding Patient B, in failing to conduct a radiologic procedure during surgery and failing to undertake sufficient investigations during the post-operative period before discharging the patient.
Regarding Patient E, in failing to refer the patient to a surgeon with the requisite skill to manage a difficult and locally-advanced tumor.
On March 30, 2010, the Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:
1. Dr. DePass attend before the panel to be reprimanded on a date not later than three months from the date that the order becomes final.
2. The Registrar impose the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. DePass' certificate of registration for an indefinite period of time:
a) Dr. DePass' practice shall be limited to being a surgical assistant in a hospital setting, and he may only practise as a surgical assistant while a certified surgeon who has been approved by the College is performing the surgery and is in attendance. This means that he may only assist other surgeons on their cases and cannot be the primary surgeon in any case, and that he is precluded from providing pre-operative and post-operative care or any office practice.
b) That notice be placed in the operating room area so that all professional staff are aware of the restrictions noted in (a).
c) That so long as the above terms, conditions and limitations are in effect, Dr. DePass shall co-operate with unannounced inspections of his practice and patient charts by a College representative for the purpose of monitoring and enforcing his compliance with them.
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): June 22-24 and June 26 continuing July 7-9, 2009