skip to content

Dennery, Jean Maurice

CPSO#: 19323

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 17 Jun 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 02 Jan 1964

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Creole, English, French, Italian, Spanish

Education:University of Haiti, 1956

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective:27 Nov 1963 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 1960
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1961
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1963
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 1964
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Oct 1964
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 17 Jun 2009