THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 5:25:56 AM
Dennery, Jean Maurice
CPSO#:
19323
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
17 Jun 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
02 Jan 1964
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Creole, English, French, Italian, Spanish
Education: University of Haiti, 1956
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurosurgery |
Effective:27 Nov 1963 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 19 Aug 1960 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1961 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1963 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jan 1964 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Oct 1964 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 17 Jun 2009 |