skip to content

Deitel, Mervyn

CPSO#: 21092

MEMBER STATUS
Revoked: Discipline Committee as of 24 Apr 1996
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 24 Apr 1996
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1961
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1962
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 1967
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 24 Apr 1996

Previous Hearings Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 24 Apr 1996
Summary:

 In April 1996, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Deitel guilty of professional misconduct, as 
 defined in what is now s. 29(33) of Ontario Regulation 548/90, as amended, in that he committed 
 sexual impropriety with a patient.  The Committee also found Dr. Deitel incompetent, as defined in 
 s. 61(4) of the Health Disciplines Act, 1990, as amended, in that he displayed in his professional 
 care of a patient a lack of knowledge, skill or judgment or disregard for the welfare of the 
 patient of a nature or to an extent that demonstrates he is unfit to continue in practice.  
 Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. Deitel(s licence to practice be revoked.


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: Appeal Abandoned
Appeal Decision Date: 17 Sep 1997
Hearing Date(s): Aug 09, 1994