THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 0:46:31 AM
Deitel, Mervyn
CPSO#:
21092
MEMBER STATUS
Revoked: Discipline Committee as of
24 Apr 1996
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
19 Oct 1967
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1961
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1961 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 14 Jun 1962 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Oct 1967 |
Revoked: Discipline Committee. |
Effective: 24 Apr 1996 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 24 Apr 1996
Summary:
In April 1996, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Deitel guilty of professional misconduct, as defined in what is now s. 29(33) of Ontario Regulation 548/90, as amended, in that he committed sexual impropriety with a patient. The Committee also found Dr. Deitel incompetent, as defined in s. 61(4) of the Health Disciplines Act, 1990, as amended, in that he displayed in his professional care of a patient a lack of knowledge, skill or judgment or disregard for the welfare of the patient of a nature or to an extent that demonstrates he is unfit to continue in practice. Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. Deitel's licence to practice be revoked.
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: Appeal Abandoned
Appeal Decision Date: 1997-09-17
Hearing Date(s): Aug 09, 1994