skip to content

Deb, Saswata

CPSO#: 90852

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2021
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 21 Jul 2021

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University of Toronto
Postgraduate Medical Education
Suite 602
500 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1V7 Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:21 Jun 2021 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SASWATA DEB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DEB is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 31 Dec 2018
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2019 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 28 Jul 2019
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 29 Jul 2019 to 09 Feb 2020
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 10 Feb 2020 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2020 to 07 Feb 2021
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Oct 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Oct 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Feb 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 2021