THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 19:32:41 PM
Deb, Saswata
CPSO#:
90852
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
21 Jul 2021
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
2075 Bayview Ave
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Emergency Medicine
C753
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Phone: 4164804037
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:21 Jun 2021 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:02 Nov 2022 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SASWATA DEB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DEB is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Cardiac Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Cardiac Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Cardiac Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Cardiac Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Cardiac Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Cardiac Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiac Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiac Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiac Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 31 Dec 2018
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiac Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2019 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiac Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 28 Jul 2019
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiac Surgery
University of Toronto, 29 Jul 2019 to 09 Feb 2020
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 10 Feb 2020 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2020 to 07 Feb 2021
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 04 Oct 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 04 Oct 2016 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2017 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2017 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 07 Feb 2021 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2021 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Jul 2021 |