skip to content

De Villa, Maria Antonina

CPSO#: 30994

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 25 Aug 2021
EXPIRY DATE
25 Aug 2021
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 Jul 1979

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Filipino

Education:University of the Philippines, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: M. de Villa Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 21 2021

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:01 Jan 1978 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective:06 Dec 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 25 Aug 2021