THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 17:36:05 PM
De Villa, Maria Antonina
CPSO#:
30994
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
25 Aug 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 Jul 1979
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Filipino
Education: University of the Philippines, 1967
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: M. de Villa Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 21 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:01 Jan 1978 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:06 Dec 1982 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Jul 1979 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 25 Aug 2021 |