skip to content

De Croos, Joseph Annson Bennet

CPSO#: 85635

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 30 Sep 2006

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Sinhala, Tamil

Education:University of Colombo, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Annson De Croos Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 10 2018

Medical Records Location

Address: 728 Anderson St Whitby, ON L1N 3V6
Date Received: 12 Jun 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Sep 2006
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Sep 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 29 Mar 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 19 Oct 2007
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 19 Oct 2007
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2018