THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 5:05:18 AM
De Croos, Joseph Annson Bennet
CPSO#:
85635
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jul 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
30 Sep 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Sinhala, Tamil
Education: University of Colombo, 1971
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Annson De Croos Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 10 2018
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:728 Anderson St
Whitby, ON L1N 3V6
Date Received: 12 Jun 2018
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 30 Sep 2006 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Sep 2006 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 29 Mar 2008 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 19 Oct 2007 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 19 Oct 2007 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jul 2018 |