skip to content

De Buck Van Overstraeten, Anthony Jean Pierre Ghislain C M

CPSO#: 99830

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2017
EXPIRY DATE
24 Mar 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 Jul 2017
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Katholieke Universiteit Leuven, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Department of Surgery
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Anthony De Buck Van Overstraeten Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 11 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. A. De Buck Van Overstraeten ( CPSO# 99830 )
Dr. Y. Hoydonckx ( CPSO# 113508)

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
Department of Surgery
Room 455
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 01 Jul 2017 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2013 to 16 Apr 2013
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Colorectal Surgery

University of Toronto, 17 Apr 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Colorectal Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 23 Jan 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Apr 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 24 Mar 2020

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2017 Active
             1.    Dr. Anthony Jean Pierre Ghislain C M De Buck Van Overstraeten may
                  practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Surgery,
                        University of Toronto, in which Dr. De Buck Van Overstraeten holds
                        an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from
                  the date of issuance or when Dr. De Buck Van Overstraeten  no longer
                  holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever
                  comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the College receives a report indicating that Dr. De Buck Van
                        Overstraeten's clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment,
                        professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. De Buck Van
                        Overstraeten's certificate of registration, following consideration
                        of the practice assessment report. 
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on July 1, 2017, and currently has an interim
                  expiry date of March 24, 2020.  The expiry date of this certificate may
                  be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.