THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 22:07:22 PM
De Buck Van Overstraeten, Anthony Jean Pierre Ghislain C M
CPSO#:
99830
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
01 Jul 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Dutch, English, French
Education: Katholieke Universiteit Leuven, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Department of Surgery
600 University Ave
Toronto ON M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-4800
Fax: 416 712 4747
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:01 Jul 2017 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2013 to 16 Apr 2013
PEAP - CF - Colorectal Surgery
University of Toronto, 17 Apr 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Colorectal Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 23 Jan 2013 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Apr 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2017 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2024 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Jan 2020 |
|
Active |