skip to content

Dawson, David Fredrick Laing

CPSO#: 24714

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 29 Jun 1972
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 May 2019
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cambridge Memorial Hospital
700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 3G2
Phone: (519) 621-2330 Electoral District: 03

Additional Practice Location(s)

231 Bay Street North
Hamilton ON  L8R 2R1
Canada
Phone: (905) 540-8532
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

55 Wyndham Street N
#212
Guelph ON  N1H 7T8
Canada
Phone: 519 837-4444
County: County of Wellington
Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: David F. L. Dawson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 31 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Dawson ( CPSO# 24714 )

Business Address:
Cambridge Memorial Hospital
700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 3G2
Phone Number: (519) 621-2300

Business Address:
212 - 55 Wyndham Street North
Guelph ON  N1H 7T8
Phone Number: (519) 837-4444

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 13 Nov 1972 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Nov 1967
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1968
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1972
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 May 2019
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 01 May 2019

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
member Effective: 01 May 2019 Active
             As from May 1, 2019, the following are imposed as terms, conditions and
            limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. David Fredrick Laing
            Dawson, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Dawson to
            the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                              DR. DAVID FREDRICK LAING DAWSON
                                          ("Dr. Dawson")
                  
                                                to 
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
                  
                  
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "Discipline Committee" means the Discipline Committee of the College;
                  
                  "IEP" means Individualized Education Plan;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan; 
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public;
                  
                  "QAC" means the Quality Assurance Committee of the College.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Dawson, certificate of registration number 24714, am a member of
                  the College.  

            (3)   I, Dr. Dawson, acknowledge that concerns have been identified with
                  respect to my knowledge, skill and judgment.  I am aware of the College's
                  concern about protecting the public.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (4)   I, Dr. Dawson, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective immediately.

            (5)   Clinical Supervision

                  (a)   I, Dr. Dawson, undertake to practise under the guidance of a
                        clinical supervisor or supervisors acceptable to the College (the
                        "Clinical Supervisor" or "Clinical Supervisors"), for at least six
                        (6) months ("Clinical Supervision").  
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Dawson, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical
                        Supervisor's undertaking attached hereto as Appendix "A", and
                        understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor. The
                        Clinical Supervisor will, at minimum:
                  
                        (i)   Facilitate the education program set out in the IEP attached
                              as Appendix "B";
                  
                        (ii)  Meet with me at my Practice Location, or another location
                              approved by the College, once every month;
                  
                        (iii) Review at least ten (10) of my patient charts at every
                              meeting;
                  
                        (iv)  Discuss any concerns arising from the chart reviews;
                  
                        (v)   Make recommendations to me for practice improvements and
                              ongoing professional development and inquire into my
                              compliance with the recommendations;
                  
                        (vi)  Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents
                              or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the
                              Clinical Supervisor deems necessary to my Clinical
                              Supervision; and
                  
                        (vii) Submit written reports to the College at least once every
                              quarter, or more frequently if the Clinical Supervisor has
                              concerns about my standard of practice.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Dawson, acknowledge that the charts reviewed shall be
                        selected by the Clinical Supervisor based on the educational needs
                        identified in the IEP set out at Appendix "B" to my Undertaking, as
                        well as the areas of concern identified in the report of the
                        assessor dated August 28, 2018, and concerns that may arise during
                        the period of Clinical Supervision.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Dawson, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical
                        Supervision of my practice described in section (5) of this
                        Undertaking and Appendix "A" attached, and undertake to abide by
                        the recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor, including but not
                        limited to recommended practice improvements and ongoing
                        professional development. 
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Dawson, acknowledge that in making its determination that I
                        may return to unsupervised practice, the College may require that I
                        sign a further undertaking imposing terms, conditions and
                        limitations on my certificate of registration or requiring ongoing
                        re-assessments, clinical supervision and/or monitoring. 
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Dawson, undertake to ensure that Appendix "A" to this
                        Undertaking is signed and delivered to the College within thirty
                        (30) days of the date I execute this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (g)   I, Dr. Dawson, undertake that if a person who has given an
                        undertaking in Appendix "A" to this Undertaking is unable or
                        unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within
                        twenty (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed
                        undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who
                        is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the
                        College within that time.
                  
                  (h)   I, Dr. Dawson, undertake that if I am unable to obtain a Clinical
                        Supervisor as set out in sections (5)(f) and (5)(g) above,
                        including returning a signed Appendix "A" within thirty (30) days,
                        I will cease practising medicine until such time as I have obtained
                        a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.  
                  
                  (i)   I, Dr. Dawson, acknowledge that if I am required to cease practise
                        as a result of section (5)(h) above this will constitute a term,
                        condition or limitation on my certificate of registration and said
                        term, condition or limitation will be included on the public
                        register.
                  
            (6)   Professional Education

                  (a)   I, Dr. Dawson, undertake to participate in and successfully
                        complete the following professional education (the "Professional
                        Education"):
                  
                        (i)   a program or programs satisfactory to the College in: 
                  
                              1.    medical record keeping; and
                  
                              2.    adolescent psychiatry; Schulich Medicine & Dentistry -
                                    Department of Psychiatry, 2019 Division of Child and
                                    Adolescent Psychiatry Annual Conference - "Youth mental
                                    health:  Evidence based interventions along the
                                    continuum of care"
                  
                        (ii)  all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as Appendix
                              "B"; and
                  
                        (iii) any additional professional education recommended by my
                              Clinical Supervisor.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Dawson, undertake to provide proof to the College of my
                        successful completion of the Professional Education, including
                        proof of registration and attendance and participant assessment
                        reports, within one (1) month of completing it. I acknowledge that
                        the College will determine, in its sole discretion, whether I have
                        successfully completed the Professional Education.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Dawson, acknowledge that a report or reports may be provided
                        to the College regarding my progress and compliance with the
                        Professional Education.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Dawson, undertake to complete this requirement by the first
                        possible opportunity after I execute this Undertaking.
                  
            (7)   Reassessment of Practice  

                  (a)   I, Dr. Dawson, undertake that, approximately three (3) months after
                        the completion of the Clinical Supervision and the Professional
                        Education set out above and in Appendix "A" and Appendix "B"
                        attached, I will submit to a reassessment of my practice (the
                        "Reassessment") by an assessor or assessors selected by the College
                        (the "Assessor" or "Assessors").  I acknowledge that the
                        Reassessment may include a chart review, direct observation of my
                        care, interviews with colleagues and co-workers, feedback from
                        patients and any other tools deemed necessary by the College.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Dawson, undertake to co-operate fully with the Reassessment
                        conducted under section (7) of this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Dawson, acknowledge and provide consent that my Clinical
                        Supervisor may receive and review the findings of the Assessor, and
                        may discuss with the Assessor any issues or concerns arising from
                        the Reassessment. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Dawson, acknowledge that the results of the Reassessment
                        will be provided to me and reported to the College and the
                        Reassessment may form the basis of further action by the College. 
                  
            (8)   Monitoring

                  (a)   I, Dr. Dawson, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location that I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Independent
                        Health Facilities with which I am affiliated, in any jurisdiction
                        (collectively my "Practice Location" of "Practice Locations"),
                        within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward,
                        I further undertake to inform the College of any and all new
                        Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at
                        that location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Dawson, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere
                        with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations and patient
                        records by a College representative for the purposes of monitoring
                        my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT 

            (9)   I, Dr. Dawson, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to
                  in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (10)  I, Dr. Dawson, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking.

            (11)  I, Dr. Dawson, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions
                  of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in
                  reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do
                  so.

            (12)  I, Dr. Dawson, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking
                  to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at
                  any Practice Location ("Chief of Staff" or "Chiefs of Staff").

            (13)  I, Dr. Dawson, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in any one or more of the following:
                  consideration by the QAC, an investigation by the College, or further
                  action by the College, including a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee.

            (14)  I, Dr. Dawson, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (15)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Dawson, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Dawson, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (15)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                        Concerns have been identified with respect to Dr. Dawson's
                        knowledge, skill and judgment. As a result:
                  
                              Dr. Dawson will practise under the guidance of a Clinical
                              Supervisor acceptable to the College for 6 months. 
                  
                              Dr. Dawson will engage in professional education in medical
                              record keeping and adolescent psychiatry.
                  
                              Dr. Dawson's practice will be reassessed by an assessor
                              selected by the College within 3 months of the end of the
                              education program.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (16)  I, Dr. Dawson, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                  appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or institution that
                  may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my
                  compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

            (17)  I, Dr. Dawson, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent form,
                  attached hereto as Appendix "C".

            (18)  I, Dr. Dawson, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to any person who facilitates my completion of the
                  Professional Education and to all Clinical Supervisors and Assessors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (19)  I, Dr. Dawson, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
                  Chiefs of Staff with any information arising from the monitoring of my
                  compliance with this Undertaking.

            (20)  I, Dr. Dawson, give my irrevocable consent to all Clinical Supervisors,
                  Chiefs of Staff, Assessors, and any persons who facilitate my completion
                  of the Professional Education, to disclose to the College, and to one
                  another, any information:

                  (a)   relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   relevant to the provisions of the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking
                        set out at Appendix "A";
                  
                  (c)   relevant to the Reassessment;
                  
                  (d)   relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this
                        Undertaking; and  
                  (e)   which comes to their attention in the course of providing the
                        Professional Education and which they reasonably believe indicates
                        a potential risk of harm to my patients.

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: Member
Active Date: May 1, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. David Frederick Laing Dawson to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective May 1, 2019:

Concerns have been identified with respect to Dr. Dawson’s knowledge, skill and judgment. As a result:

Dr. Dawson will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for 6 months.

Dr. Dawson will engage in professional education in medical record keeping and adolescent psychiatry.

Dr. Dawson’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within 3 months of the end of the education program.