THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 7:03:37 AM
Dawson, David Fredrick Laing
CPSO#:
24714
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Aug 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
01 May 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of British Columbia Faculty o, 1967
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: David F. L. Dawson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 4 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:13 Nov 1972 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 10 Nov 1967 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 15 Jun 1968 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jul 1971 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jun 1972 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 May 2019 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member |
Effective: 01 May 2019 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Aug 2021 |
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: April 26, 2021
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. David Frederick Laing Dawson to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective April 26, 2021:
Dr. Dawson underwent remediation and submitted to a reassessment of my practice. The reassessment report subsequently received by the College raised concerns about Dr. Dawson’s standard of practice in psychiatry. As of August 1, 2021, Dr. Dawson ceased to practise medicine in all jurisdictions and therefore cannot see any patients or provide any medical advice or services.
Download Full Document (PDF)