skip to content

Dao, Chung Van

CPSO#: 99467

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 22 Oct 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 22 Oct 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Vietnamese

Education:Medical University of the Americas, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
700 Main Street East
Hamilton ON  L8M 1K7
Phone: (905) 547-3901
Fax: (905) 547-4051 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

200 Terrace Hill St
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Canada
Phone: (905) 751-5858
County: County of Brant
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: C. Dao Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 21 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Dao ( CPSO# 99467 )

Business Address:
700 Main Street East
Hamilton ON  L8M 1K7
Phone Number: (905) 547-3901

Business Address:
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Phone Number: (519) 751-5544


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Wisconsin

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
Brant Community Healthcare System,Willett Site Paris
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 11 Jul 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CHUNG VAN DAO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAO is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Oct 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Oct 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 01 Apr 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 13 May 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 22 Oct 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2013