THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 14:48:51 PM
Dao, Chung Van
CPSO#:
99467
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
22 Oct 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Oct 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Vietnamese
Education: Medical University of the Americas (Beli, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
446 Concession St
Hamilton ON L9A 1C2
Phone: 905-547-3901
Electoral District: 04
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Wisconsin
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre |
Hamilton |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:11 Jul 2013 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CHUNG VAN DAO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAO is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 02 Oct 2012 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 02 Oct 2012 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 01 Apr 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 13 May 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 22 Oct 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Oct 2013 |