skip to content

Danyluk, Angie

CPSO#: 90377

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 19 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 19 Jul 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Royal Victoria Hospital
201 Georgian Drive, Barrie ON, L4M
Penetanguishene ON  L9M 1G3
Phone: (705) 728-9090
Fax: (705)739-5631 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Angie Danyluk Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 14 2021

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Danyluk ( CPSO# 90377 )

Business Address:
201 Georgian Dr
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2

Business Address:
201 Georgian Dr
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:04 May 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Forensic Psychiatry Effective:26 Sep 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ANGIE DANYLUK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DANYLUK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 03 May 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
EL - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 May 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 2011