THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 2:23:49 AM
Danyluk, Angie
CPSO#:
90377
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
19 Jul 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
19 Jul 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Royal Victoria Hospital
201 Georgian Drive, Barrie ON, L4M
Penetanguishene ON L9M 1G3
Phone: (705) 728-9090
Fax: (705)739-5631
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre |
Barrie |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:04 May 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Forensic Psychiatry |
Effective:26 Sep 2018 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ANGIE DANYLUK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DANYLUK is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 03 May 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
EL - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 03 May 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Jul 2011 |