skip to content

Daniel, Alan Brian

CPSO#: 87631

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 23 Nov 2021
EXPIRY DATE
23 Nov 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 Aug 2007

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Afrikaans, English

Education: University of Stellenbosch, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Alan Daniel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 29 2022

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System Greater Niagara Site Niagara Falls
Niagara Health System Port Colborne General Site Port Colborne
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines
Niagara Health System,Welland County General Site Welland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:07 Dec 2000 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Aug 2007
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 23 Nov 2021