THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 12:09:29 PM
Daniel, Alan Brian
CPSO#:
87631
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
23 Nov 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 Aug 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Afrikaans, English
Education: University of Stellenbosch, 1986
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Alan Daniel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 29 2022
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients who are seeking a copy of their medical records, including former patients of Dr. Jeff Remington (66725), may send a written request to:
P.O. Box 1127
Penticton, British Columbia
V2A 6J9
Date Received: 20 Mar 2024
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
British Columbia
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:07 Dec 2000 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Aug 2007 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 23 Nov 2021 |