skip to content

Damjanovic, Jelena

CPSO#: 96912

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 15 Apr 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 07 May 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Sarajevo, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 25 Oct 2011 to 05 Feb 2012
AVP - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 12 Feb 2013 to 06 May 2013
AVP - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 07 May 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 06 May 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 07 May 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 04 May 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 05 May 2015 to 01 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 02 Jun 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 08 Feb 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 09 Feb 2016 to 07 Mar 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 08 Mar 2016 to 04 Apr 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 05 Apr 2016 to 15 Apr 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Feb 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 12 Feb 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 May 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Apr 2016