THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 7:04:29 AM
Damjanovic, Jelena
CPSO#:
96912
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
15 Apr 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
07 May 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Sarajevo, 1983
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 25 Oct 2011 to 05 Feb 2012
AVP - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 12 Feb 2013 to 06 May 2013
AVP - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 07 May 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 06 May 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 07 May 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 04 May 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 05 May 2015 to 01 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 02 Jun 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 08 Feb 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 09 Feb 2016 to 07 Mar 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 08 Mar 2016 to 04 Apr 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 05 Apr 2016 to 15 Apr 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 25 Oct 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 05 Feb 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 12 Feb 2013 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 07 May 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 15 Apr 2016 |