skip to content

Daley, Daniel Robert

CPSO#: 13940

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Date of Death: 31-Aug-2013

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1952

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Written requests for medical records should be directed to: The Wright Clinic 57 James Street Parry Sound, ON P2A 1T6 Tel: (705) 746-2181
Date Received: 30 May 2008

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1971 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 1952
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2008