THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/03/24 1:13:38 AM
Daley, Daniel Robert
CPSO#:
13940
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
07 Aug 1952
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
31-Aug-2013
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1952
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Written requests for medical records should be directed to:
The Wright Clinic
57 James Street
Parry Sound, ON
P2A 1T6
Tel: (705) 746-2181
Date Received: 30 May 2008
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1971 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Aug 1952 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2008 |