skip to content

Dales, Michael

CPSO#: 17554

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 18 Apr 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 08 Dec 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, German, Polish

Education:University of British Columbia Faculty o, 1959

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact: Dr. Sosiak Suite 204 3101 Bloor Street West Toronto, Ontario M8X 2W2 Tel: (416) 233-3343 Fax: (416) 233-0746
Date Received: 31 May 2012

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Jul 1978 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1960
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 Dec 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 08 Dec 2009
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 15 Jul 2011
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 18 Apr 2012