THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 14:55:17 PM
Dales, Michael
CPSO#:
17554
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
18 Apr 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
08 Dec 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French, German, Polish
Education: University of British Columbia Faculty o, 1959
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact:
Dr. Sosiak
Suite 204
3101 Bloor Street West
Toronto, Ontario
M8X 2W2
Tel: (416) 233-3343
Fax: (416) 233-0746
Date Received: 31 May 2012
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1978 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jun 1960 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 08 Dec 2009 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 08 Dec 2009 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 15 Jul 2011 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 18 Apr 2012 |