skip to content

Daabak, Abdulghani Mohamed

CPSO#: 90388

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 05 Apr 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 05 Apr 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Al Fateh, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
28-555 Essa Road
Barrie ON  L4N 6A9
Phone: (705) 503-5558
Fax: (705) 417-0355 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Daabak Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 18 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Daabak ( CPSO# 90388 )

Business Address:
Vaughan Medical Walk-In
104-3737 Major Mackenzie Drive
Woodbridge ON  L4H 0A2
Phone Number: (905) 417-7771

Business Address:
28-555 Essa Rd
Barrie ON  L4N 6A9
Phone Number: 7055035558

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:14 Dec 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ABDULGHANI MOHAMED DAABAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAABAK is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Apr 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Apr 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 22 Apr 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Mar 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Aug 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 05 Apr 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Apr 2012