THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 2:04:30 AM
Daabak, Abdulghani Mohamed
CPSO#:
90388
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
05 Apr 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 Apr 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicin, 2001
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
3737 Major Mackenzie Dr
104
Woodbridge ON L4H 0A2
Phone: 9054177771
Fax: 9054171377
Electoral District: 05
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Daabak Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2021
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Requests for copies of medical records can be emailed to [email protected].
Date Received: 03 Oct 2022
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Arab Emirates
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:14 Dec 2011 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ABDULGHANI MOHAMED DAABAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAABAK is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 23 Apr 2009 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 23 Apr 2009 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 22 Apr 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 03 Mar 2010 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 24 Aug 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 05 Apr 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Apr 2012 |