skip to content

D'Souza, Rohan Dominic

CPSO#: 96310

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Apr 2022
EXPIRY DATE
30 Jun 2024
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 Apr 2022

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education: Topiwala National Medical College, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1280 Main St W
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Rohan D'Souza Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 9 2022
Corporation Name: Dr. Rohan D'Souza Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 04 2022

Shareholders:
Dr. R. D'Souza ( CPSO# 96310 )

Business Address:
20-1280 Main St W
Hamilton ON  L8S 4L8

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:01 Apr 2022 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 15 Sep 2011
PEAP - CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 16 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Maternal Fetal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Maternal Fetal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Sep 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 30 Sep 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2022
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2024

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Apr 2022 Active
 1. Dr. ROHAN DOMINIC D'SOUZA may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Obstetrics and Gynecology, Division of Maternal-Fetal Medicine, McMaster University, in which Dr. D'SOUZA holds an academic appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. D'SOUZA no longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.

Note: This certificate is issued on 01 April, 2022, and expires on 30 June, 2024. Upon renewal of Dr. D'SOUZA's academic appointment at McMaster University, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraph 2 above.