THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 11:01:03 AM
D'Souza, Rohan Dominic
CPSO#:
96310
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Apr 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
01 Apr 2022
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Topiwala National Medical College, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1280 Main St W
Hamilton ON L8S 4K1
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:01 Apr 2022 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 15 Sep 2011
PEAP - CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 16 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Maternal Fetal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Maternal Fetal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Sep 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 15 Sep 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 09 Sep 2021 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 30 Sep 2021 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Apr 2022 |
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2024 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2025 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 20 Feb 2024 |
|
Active |