skip to content

D'Souza, Rohan Dominic

CPSO#: 96310

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 Sep 2014
EXPIRY DATE
14 Sep 2021
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 15 Sep 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Urdu

Education:Topiwala National Medical College, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
OPG Building
Room 3-908
700 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1Z5
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 5127
Fax: (416) 586-8649 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Rohan D'Souza Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 23 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. R. D'Souza ( CPSO# 96310 )

Business Address:
University of Toronto
Division of Maternal Fetal Medicine
3rd Floor, Suite 3-908
700 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1Z5
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:15 Sep 2014 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 15 Sep 2011
PEAP - CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University Of Toronto, 16 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Maternal Fetal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Maternal Fetal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2014
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 14 Sep 2021

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 15 Sep 2014 Active
             1.    Dr. Rohan Dominic D'Souza may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of
                        Obstetrics and Gynaecology, University of Toronto, in which Dr.
                        D'Souza holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant
                        Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from
                  the date of issuance or when Dr. D'Souza  no longer holds the academic
                  appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the College receives a report indicating that Dr. D'Souza's
                        clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional
                        conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. D'Souza's certificate
                        of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment
                        report. 
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on September 15, 2014.  In accordance with
                  paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the
                  Registration Committee, automatically expire on September 14, 2021.