skip to content

de SA, Darren Lucien

CPSO#: 98654

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
625 Greenhill Avenue
Unit 3
Hamilton ON  L8K5W9
Phone: 289-674-4400
Fax: 289-674-5500 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N3Z5
Canada
Phone: 905-521-2100
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Darren L. de SA Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 27 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. D. de SA ( CPSO# 98654 )

Business Address:
3 - 625 Greenhill Avenue
Hamilton ON  L8K 5W9
Phone Number: (289) 674-4400

Business Address:
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
C109 - 135 Fennell Avenue West
Hamilton ON  L9C 0E5
Phone Number: (289) 237-6538

Business Address:
Unit B1-B
4200 Fairview Street
Burlington ON  L7L 4Y8
Phone Number: (905) 632-0462

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DARREN LUCIEN DE SA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DE SA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 13 Aug 2018 to 31 Jan 2019
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Feb 2019 to 30 Jun 2019
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2019 to 01 Aug 2019
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017