skip to content

Homuth, David Scott

CPSO#: 95750

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 20 Dec 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North York General Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone: 416 756 6001 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. David S Homuth Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 23 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Homuth ( CPSO# 95750 )

Business Address:
North York General Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6165

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Dec 2013 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 17 Oct 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DAVID SCOTT HOMUTH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOMUTH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 2013