skip to content

Gerber, David

CPSO#: 74111

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 08 Jul 1999
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 08 Mar 2023

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Afrikaans, Dutch, English

Education: University of Stellenbosch, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Meridia Medical Group
Suite 501
1881 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4S 3C4
Phone: (416) 484-8383
Fax: (416) 481-4963 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. David Gerber Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 05 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Gerber ( CPSO# 74111 )

Business Address:
Meridia Medical Group
Suite 501
1881 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4S 3C4
Phone Number: (416) 484-8383

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
CF - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 31 Dec 2000
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 Mar 2023
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Discipline Committee Effective: 08 Mar 2023

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Discipline Committee Effective: 08 Mar 2023 Active
 As from March 8, 2023, by order of the Discipline Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, the following terms, conditions and limitations are imposed on the certificate of registration held by Dr. David Gerber: 

i. 	Dr. Gerber will participate in the PROBE Ethics & Boundaries Program offered by the Centre for Personalized Education for Professionals, by receiving a passing evaluation or grade, without condition or qualification. Dr. Gerber will complete the PROBE program within six (6) months of the date of this Order, and will provide proof to the College of his completion, including proof of registration and attendance and participant assessment reports, within one (1) month of completing it. 



Previous Hearings

Committee: Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal
Decision Date: 08 Mar 2023
Summary:

On March 8, 2023, the Tribunal found that Dr. Gerber engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct in his care and treatment of ten patients, and in his interactions with the College’s Independent Health Facilities Program and Out-of-Hospital Premises Inspection Program.

The Tribunal ordered that:
 
1. Dr. Gerber attend before the panel to be reprimanded;
2. the Registrar suspend Dr. Gerber’s certificate of registration for four months commencing April 8, 2023;
3. the Registrar place terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Gerber’s certificate of registration;
4. Dr. Gerber pay the College costs in the amount of $6,000 by April 7, 2023.
 
The panel’s reasons for decisions will be released shortly. OPSDT reasons are also available at www.opsdt.ca and https://www.canlii.org/en/on/onpsdt/. The exhibits, including the Statement of Facts and Plea of No Contest, can be obtained by contacting the Tribunal Office at [email protected]


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): 2023-03-08

Concerns

Source: Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: April 13, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)