THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 16:03:01 PM
Gerber, David
CPSO#:
74111
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
08 Aug 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
08 Aug 2023
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Afrikaans, Dutch, English
Education: University of Stellenbosch, 1987
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. David Gerber Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 6 2024
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:30 Jun 1997 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DAVID GERBER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GERBER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
CF - Urology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 31 Dec 2000
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Jul 1999 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 08 Mar 2023 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 08 Mar 2023 |
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee |
Effective: 08 Apr 2023 |
Suspension of registration removed |
Effective: 08 Aug 2023 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Aug 2023 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal
Decision Date: 08 Mar 2023
Summary:
On March 8, 2023, the Tribunal found that Dr. Gerber engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct in his care and treatment of ten patients, and in his interactions with the College’s Independent Health Facilities Program and Out-of-Hospital Premises Inspection Program.
The Tribunal ordered that:
1. Dr. Gerber attend before the panel to be reprimanded;
2. the Registrar suspend Dr. Gerber’s certificate of registration for four months commencing April 8, 2023;
3. the Registrar place terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Gerber’s certificate of registration;
4. Dr. Gerber pay the College costs in the amount of $6,000 by April 7, 2023.
More detail can be found in the reasons for decision linked below.
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): 2023-03-08
Concerns
Source:
Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: April 13, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)