skip to content

Berger-Richardson, David

CPSO#: 98725

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 01 Nov 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
265 Dundas St E
Belleville General Hospital
General Surgery
Unit 359
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Phone: 613-961-0817
Fax: 613-961-0903 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: SELF BERGER-RICHARDSON MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 04 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Self ( CPSO# 98299 )
Dr. D. Berger-Richardson ( CPSO# 98725 )

Business Address:
Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-2200

Business Address:
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Quinte Health Care,Trenton Memorial Trenton
Quinte Healthcare Prince Edward Site Picton
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:31 May 2019 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DAVID BERGER-RICHARDSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BERGER-RICHARDSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Dec 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Dec 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 31 Mar 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2019 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 6 - Surgical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
PostGrad Yr 7 - Surgical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2019