skip to content

Cunningham, Kelly Mae

CPSO#: 98250

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 26 Sep 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Vermont, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
104-450 Central Ave
London ON  N6B 2E8
Phone: 519-672-8359 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Kelly Cunningham Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 26 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Cunningham ( CPSO# 98250 )

Business Address:
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647

Business Address:
450 Central Ave
Suite 104
London ON  N6B 2E8

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Alexandra Marine and General Hospital Goderich
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
Four Counties Health Services,Newbury Newbury
Kincardine and District Site,South Bruce Grey Health Kincardine
Listowel Memorial Hospital Listowel
Niagara Health System Greater Niagara Site Niagara Falls
Niagara Health System Ontario Street Site St Catharines
Niagara Health System,Douglas Memorial Site Fort Erie
Niagara Health System,Welland County General Site Welland
South Bruce Grey Health Centre,Chesley Site Chesley
South Bruce Grey Health Centre,Durham-Memorial Site Durham
South Bruce Grey Health Centre,Walkerton Site Walkerton
South Huron Hospital Exeter
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital Tillsonburg
Wingham and District Hospital Wingham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:18 Dec 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KELLY MAE CUNNINGHAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CUNNINGHAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 27 Dec 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 28 Dec 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 18 Dec 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 19 Dec 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2018 to 31 Dec 2018
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2018