THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 9:04:13 AM
Cunningham, Kelly Mae
CPSO#:
98250
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
26 Sep 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Vermont, 2012
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
46 General Hospital Dr
Stratford ON N5A 2Y6
Phone: 2892443947
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Alexandra Marine and General Hospital |
Goderich |
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance |
Chatham |
Four Counties Health Services |
Newbury |
Huron Perth Healthcare Alliance |
Stratford |
Listowel Memorial Hospital |
Listowel |
Niagara Health System - Fort Erie Site |
Fort Erie |
Niagara Health System - Welland Site |
Welland |
Niagara Health System |
Niagara Falls |
Niagara Health System Ontario Street Site |
St Catharines |
South Bruce Grey Health Centre |
Kincardine |
South Bruce Grey Health Centre,Chesley Site |
Chesley |
South Bruce Grey Health Centre,Durham-Memorial Site |
Durham |
South Bruce Grey Health Centre,Walkerton Site |
Walkerton |
South Huron Hospital Association |
Exeter |
St Joseph's Health Care, London |
London |
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital |
Strathroy |
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital |
Tillsonburg |
Wingham and District Hospital |
Wingham |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:18 Dec 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KELLY MAE CUNNINGHAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CUNNINGHAM is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 27 Dec 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 28 Dec 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 18 Dec 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 19 Dec 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2018 to 31 Dec 2018
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Sep 2018 |