skip to content

Crowe, Anne Rosemary

CPSO#: 32280

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 08 Aug 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 08 Aug 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
385 Frederick St # 16
Kitchener ON  N2H 2P2
Phone: 519-745-7482
Fax: 855-658-1456 Electoral District: 03

Additional Practice Location(s)

Grand River Hospital
P O Box 9056
3570 King Street East
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Freeport Site Kitchener
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Jul 1981 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ANNE ROSEMARY CROWE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CROWE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Apr 1981
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 Sep 2015
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 10 Sep 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 2018